LA HB46 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the allocation of incarcerated persons for the purposes of all redistricting by the legislature
Title
Provides relative to the allocation of incarcerated persons for the purposes of all redistricting by the legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-08 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2019. |
2019-03-07 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-07 | House | Prefiled. |