LA HB483 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extends authority to grant tax credits for certain state-certified musical or theatrical facility infrastructure projects (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Extends authority to grant tax credits for certain state-certified musical or theatrical facility infrastructure projects (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 483 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#845) (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 483 FINAL PASSAGE (#915) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 483 FINAL PASSAGE (#445) (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 483 FINAL PASSAGE (#915) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 483 FINAL PASSAGE (#445) (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2013. |
2013-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 197. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 79, nays 6, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-15 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |