LA HB525 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Increases the income threshold for purposes of qualifying for the special assessment level (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Increases the income threshold for purposes of qualifying for the special assessment level (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 525 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#700) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 525 FINAL PASSAGE (#587) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 525 FINAL PASSAGE (#403) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12HouseEffective date: See Act.
2020-06-12HouseBecomes Act No. 369.
2020-06-04HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without amendments (9-0-1).
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-05-13HouseReported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB525&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163406
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171057
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178628
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182643
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170689
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170999
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176712
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177468
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178129
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178382
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163425
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168650
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171254
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171533
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176895
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179317
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1187222
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175647
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177794

Bill Comments

feedback