LA HB55 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to evidence of causation from nonuse of a safety belt (Item #40)
Title
Provides relative to evidence of causation from nonuse of a safety belt (Item #40)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 55 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#148) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#129) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#73) (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#129) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote on HB 55 FINAL PASSAGE (#73) (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2020-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-06-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20. |
2020-06-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-06-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/18/20. |
2020-06-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-15 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0-1). |
2020-06-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-06-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |