LA HB573 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to container sizes for beverages of high alcohol content
Title
Provides relative to container sizes for beverages of high alcohol content
Sponsors
Rep. Paula Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 573 FINAL PASSAGE (#586) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |