LA HB579 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to pharmacist authorization to dispense HIV pre-exposure and post-exposure prophylaxis
Title
Provides relative to pharmacist authorization to dispense HIV pre-exposure and post-exposure prophylaxis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 579 FINAL PASSAGE (#425) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |