LA HB58 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to simple burglary
Title
Provides relative to simple burglary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#229) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-09 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024. |
2024-02-06 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-06 | House | Prefiled. |