LA HB60 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:00 am in Room F
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:00 am in Room F
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the unauthorized use of sperm, ovum, or embryo
Title
Provides relative to the unauthorized use of sperm, ovum, or embryo
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#482) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-09 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024. |
2024-02-06 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-06 | House | Prefiled. |