LA HB621 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to vapor products (EG1 NO IMPACT SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to vapor products (EG1 NO IMPACT SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 621 FINAL PASSAGE (#314) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |