LA HB641 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the La. Rural Jobs Act Tax Credit Program (RE -$90,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Establishes the La. Rural Jobs Act Tax Credit Program (RE -$90,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 641 FINAL PASSAGE (#412) (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2017-04-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-04-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |