LA HB684 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 1:00 pm in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 1:00 pm in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to bear hunting
Title
Provides relative to bear hunting
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] | Rep. Vincent Cox [R] | Rep. Jason DeWitt [R] | Rep. Gabe Firment [R] |
Rep. Adrian Fisher [D] | Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] | Rep. Christopher Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 684 FINAL PASSAGE (#262) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 10. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |