LA HB687 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the licensing of "PACE" program providers (RE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the licensing of "PACE" program providers (RE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 687 FINAL PASSAGE (#264) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 5. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |