LA HB695 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an overweight permit to transport earthen material for government funded levee projects (RE1 +$50,000 SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates an overweight permit to transport earthen material for government funded levee projects (RE1 +$50,000 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 695 FINAL PASSAGE (#88) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2024. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |