LA HB71 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the display of the Ten Commandments in schools
Title
Requires the display of the Ten Commandments in schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 FINAL PASSAGE (#381) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 AMENDMENT # 2758 BY WALTERS MOTION TO ADOPT (#380) (Y: 30 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 AMENDMENT # 2754 BY HUGHES MOTION TO ADOPT (#379) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 AMENDMENT # 2755 BY HUGHES MOTION TO ADOPT (#378) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 AMENDMENT # 2749 BY LANDRY M. MOTION TO ADOPT (#377) (Y: 29 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 AMENDMENT # 2758 BY WALTERS MOTION TO ADOPT (#380) (Y: 30 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 AMENDMENT # 2754 BY HUGHES MOTION TO ADOPT (#379) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 AMENDMENT # 2755 BY HUGHES MOTION TO ADOPT (#378) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 71 AMENDMENT # 2749 BY LANDRY M. MOTION TO ADOPT (#377) (Y: 29 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (10-3). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-09 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024. |
2024-02-08 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-08 | House | Prefiled. |