LA HB737 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a person from engaging in picketing at the residence or dwelling of an individual (EG INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Prohibits a person from engaging in picketing at the residence or dwelling of an individual (EG INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 737 FINAL PASSAGE (#362) (Y: 85 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |