LA HB77 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the disposition of certain local sales and use taxes at the Angola State Penitentiary Prison Rodeo (EG -$23,460 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the disposition of certain local sales and use taxes at the Angola State Penitentiary Prison Rodeo (EG -$23,460 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 77 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 92 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-11 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |
2024-02-16 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2024. |
2024-02-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-02-14 | House | Prefiled. |