LA HB778 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of penalties via unmanned automated speed enforcement devices in a school zone in certain circumstances
Title
Prohibits the imposition of penalties via unmanned automated speed enforcement devices in a school zone in certain circumstances
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bayham [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 778 FINAL PASSAGE (#222) (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 105, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 490 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works (12-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB490 (Replaces) 2024-03-26 - Becomes HB 778.