LA HB779 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the definition of "commercial sexual activity" within the crime of trafficking of children for sexual purposes
Title
Provides relative to the definition of "commercial sexual activity" within the crime of trafficking of children for sexual purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 779 FINAL PASSAGE (#403) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |