LA HB790 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB196
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the effectiveness provision of the insurance fraud investigation unit within the Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Title
Repeals the effectiveness provision of the insurance fraud investigation unit within the Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 790 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 790 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 790 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 196 reported by the Committee on Insurance (13-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB196 (Replaces) 2024-03-27 - Becomes HB 790.