LA HB792 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB343
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to criminal adjudications (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Title
Provides relative to criminal adjudications (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Rep. Robert Carter [D] | Rep. Vincent Cox [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] |
Rep. Alonzo Knox [D] | Rep. Vanessa Caston Lafleur [D] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 792 FINAL PASSAGE (#270) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 343 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (13-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB343 (Replaces) 2024-03-27 - Becomes HB 792.