LA HB823 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 18, nays 68. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 18, nays 68. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for heightened drinking water quality standards and increased enforcement of water system safety regulations in certain municipalities
Title
Provides for heightened drinking water quality standards and increased enforcement of water system safety regulations in certain municipalities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 823 FINAL PASSAGE (#798) (Y: 18 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 823 AMENDMENT # 3708 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#556) (Y: 44 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 823 AMENDMENT # 3708 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#556) (Y: 44 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 18, nays 68. Failed to pass. |
2016-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016. |
2016-05-09 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2016. |
2016-05-05 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-05 | House | Notice removed |
2016-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016. |
2016-05-02 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-02 | House | Notice removed |
2016-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2016. |
2016-04-27 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-27 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |