LA HB876 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Becomes HB 970.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Becomes HB 970.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the definition of "alternative nicotine product"
Title
Provides relative to the definition of "alternative nicotine product"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Becomes HB 970. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported by substitute (17-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |