LA HB899 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Hope for Louisiana Patients Law (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Hope for Louisiana Patients Law (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] | Rep. Stephanie Berault [R] | Rep. Raymond Crews [R] | Rep. Peter Egan [R] |
Rep. Jay Galle [R] | Rep. Brach Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 899 FINAL PASSAGE (#810) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-30 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-29 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-24 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |