LA HB906 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes revisions to the Campaign Finance Disclosure Act (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Makes revisions to the Campaign Finance Disclosure Act (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 906 FINAL PASSAGE (#532) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 906 FINAL PASSAGE (#532) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 906 FINAL PASSAGE (#532) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 11. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |