LA HB927 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to certain permits required by parishes and municipalities
Title
Provides with respect to certain permits required by parishes and municipalities
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Selders [D] | Rep. Marcus Bryant [D] | Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R] | Rep. Adrian Fisher [D] |
Rep. Jacob Landry [R] | Rep. Sylvia Taylor [D] | Rep. Joy Walters [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#755) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |