LA HB933 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the schedule of basic child support obligations
Title
Provides for the schedule of basic child support obligations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 933 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1187) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 933 FINAL PASSAGE (#1050) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 933 FINAL PASSAGE (#397) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 933 FINAL PASSAGE (#1050) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 933 FINAL PASSAGE (#397) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 602. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016. |
2016-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016. |
2016-04-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported favorably (8-0-1). |
2016-03-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2016-03-29 | House | Read by title. |