LA HB948 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the recording of grand jury proceedings, preparation of transcripts, and review of grand jury proceedings under certain circumstances
Title
Allows the recording of grand jury proceedings, preparation of transcripts, and review of grand jury proceedings under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB948 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=688681 |