LA HB953 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to life safety and property protection and conveyance devices
Title
Provides relative to life safety and property protection and conveyance devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 953 FINAL PASSAGE (#629) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |