LA HB963 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB14
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to reemployment of retirees in the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (RE INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to reemployment of retirees in the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (RE INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 963 FINAL PASSAGE (#515) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 14 reported by the Committee on Retirement (10-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Replaces) 2024-04-09 - Becomes HB 963.