LA HB994 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 07/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 07/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to contracts for additional housing for individuals in the custody of the DPS&C
Title
Provides relative to contracts for additional housing for individuals in the custody of the DPS&C
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 994 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1143) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 994 FINAL PASSAGE (#936) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 994 FINAL PASSAGE (#615) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 994 FINAL PASSAGE (#936) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 994 FINAL PASSAGE (#615) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 561. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2016. |
2016-04-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read by title. |