LA HCR102 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study provisions of law and make recommendations regarding modular homes
Title
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study provisions of law and make recommendations regarding modular homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 102 ADOPT (#1327) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 102 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1246) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 102 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1246) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 77, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-14 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |