LA HCR16 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Madame Chief Justice Bernette Joshua Johnson of the Louisiana Supreme Court on her retirement
Title
Commends Madame Chief Justice Bernette Joshua Johnson of the Louisiana Supreme Court on her retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 16 CO-AUTHORS (#49) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 16 ADOPT (#48) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 16 ADOPT (#48) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |