LA HCR34 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends G.W. Carver Primary School in Ascension Parish upon receipt of the 2017 TAP Founder's Award from the National Institute for Excellence in Teaching
Title
Commends G.W. Carver Primary School in Ascension Parish upon receipt of the 2017 TAP Founder's Award from the National Institute for Excellence in Teaching
Sponsors
Rep. John Berthelot [R] | Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Sen. Edward Price [D] | Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] |
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 34 ADOPT (#63) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-04-19 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-04-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |