LA HCR36 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates March 27, 2024, as "Anti-Hunger Day" in Louisiana
Title
Designates March 27, 2024, as "Anti-Hunger Day" in Louisiana
Sponsors
Rep. Paula Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 36 CONCUR (#163) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |