LA HCR42 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Louisiana State University AgCenter and the Southern University Ag Center to work together to study alternative uses of sugarcane bagasse and to make recommendations on how such alternatives can be used to benefit sugarcane producers economically
Title
Urges and requests the Louisiana State University AgCenter and the Southern University Ag Center to work together to study alternative uses of sugarcane bagasse and to make recommendations on how such alternatives can be used to benefit sugarcane producers economically
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House Vote on HCR 42 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#770) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |