LA HCR48 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study I-12 express tolling operations compared to how other states implement express tolling
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study I-12 express tolling operations compared to how other states implement express tolling
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 48 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#604) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 87, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |