LA HCR53 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the commissioner of insurance to investigate the potential for creating a Coastal Reinsurance Assistance Program
Title
Requests the commissioner of insurance to investigate the potential for creating a Coastal Reinsurance Assistance Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House Vote on HCR 53 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#767) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |