LA HCR90 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends from March 11, 2020, until September 30, 2020, the provisions of law applicable to mineral leases maintained in production in paying quantities
Title
Suspends from March 11, 2020, until September 30, 2020, the provisions of law applicable to mineral leases maintained in production in paying quantities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |