LA HR219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Vera Institute of Justice to study certain eligibility and qualification requirements for jurors
Title
Requests the Vera Institute of Justice to study certain eligibility and qualification requirements for jurors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HR 219 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#631) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 7. The resolution was adopted. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |