LA SB101 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to ranked-choice voting and instant runoff voting. (gov sig) (EG1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to ranked-choice voting and instant runoff voting. (gov sig) (EG1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 101 FINAL PASSAGE (#49) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (8-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |