LA SB134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for addition of "Home of the Who Dat Nation Highway" signs on Interstate 10 in Louisiana and designates U.S. Hwy 90 from its intersection with I-10 in Lafayette to its intersection with La. Hwy 308 in Raceland as the "Governor Kathleen Babineaux Blanco Highway". (8/1/19) (EN +$4,400 SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides for addition of "Home of the Who Dat Nation Highway" signs on Interstate 10 in Louisiana and designates U.S. Hwy 90 from its intersection with I-10 in Lafayette to its intersection with La. Hwy 308 in Raceland as the "Governor Kathleen Babineaux Blanco Highway". (8/1/19) (EN +$4,400 SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 134 CONCUR (#522) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 134 FINAL PASSAGE (#590) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 134 FINAL PASSAGE (#211) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 134 FINAL PASSAGE (#590) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 134 FINAL PASSAGE (#211) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2019. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 368. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |