LA SB155 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-08 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 50. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-08 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 50. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to authorize the postsecondary education management boards to establish tuition and fee amounts charged by institutions under their supervision and management. (2/3-CA13sl(A)) (RR INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to authorize the postsecondary education management boards to establish tuition and fee amounts charged by institutions under their supervision and management. (2/3-CA13sl(A)) (RR INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#869) (Y: 49 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 155 AMENDMENT # 4602 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#868) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 155 AMENDMENT # 4602 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#868) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 155 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 50. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-04 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported favorably (11-6). |
2015-05-21 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-05-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |