LA SB163 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an exemption for certain contractors to the licensure requirements of the Horticulture Commission. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides an exemption for certain contractors to the licensure requirements of the Horticulture Commission. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 CONCUR (#606) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#544) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#169) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12SenateEffective date 6/12/2020.
2020-06-12SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 308.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-28SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-28HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-28HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-28HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2020-05-13SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2020-02-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB163&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160044
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169681
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178047
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182495
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168711
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171518
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174515
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174954
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177100
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160047
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170672
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174582
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180732
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171949
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177062
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177885

Bill Comments

feedback