LA SB186 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective date 1/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective date 1/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact. (1/1/24) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact. (1/1/24) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#958) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#110) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#110) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2024. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 263. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2023-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 8. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023. |
2023-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (9-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-11 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |