LA SB198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to prohibitions to dual candidacy. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides relative to prohibitions to dual candidacy. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 198 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-08 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 7 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |