LA SB199 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to motor vehicle titles. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides relative to motor vehicle titles. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#147) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |