LA SB204 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the issuance of bonds to finance capital improvements for the Louisiana Community and Technical Colleges System. (2/3-CA7s6(F)(1))(gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the issuance of bonds to finance capital improvements for the Louisiana Community and Technical Colleges System. (2/3-CA7s6(F)(1))(gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 204 CONCUR (#815) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#705) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#255) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#705) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#255) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/17/2013. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 360. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 4 nays. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 11. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported with amendments (19-3) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |