LA SB249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Agricultural Chemistry and Seed Commission. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Agricultural Chemistry and Seed Commission. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 249 FINAL PASSAGE (#123) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |