LA SB261 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the governing authority of the Sunset Drainage District of St. Charles Parish. (7/1/12)
Title
Provides relative to the governing authority of the Sunset Drainage District of St. Charles Parish. (7/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261, CONCUR (#866) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 261, FINAL PASSAGE (#626) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261, FINAL PASSAGE (#316) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 261, FINAL PASSAGE (#626) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 261, FINAL PASSAGE (#316) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Effective date 7/1/12. | |
2011-06-28 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 319. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-15 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2011-06-01 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-31 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |