LA SB272 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the M.J. Foster Promise Award Program. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Provides relative to the M.J. Foster Promise Award Program. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#285) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |